+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce & Labor.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- And refer to Commerce & Labor.
- AWRD - Majority; without recommendation.
- Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 9:00 AM.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (AGNR 16).
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 2.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2430-S AMH STAN H4388.2
ADOPTED 02/12/2016