+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Placed on third reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 14).
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor