+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- LAWS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor