+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 274, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- HSRR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- HSEL - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor