+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- ELHS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).