+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020*.
- Chapter 336, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTC - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations. (View Original Bill)
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor