+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 174, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CPB 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. (View Original Bill)
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor