+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- CB - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).