+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EET - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 16).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.