+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
On December 29, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor