+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations. (View Original Bill)
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.