+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On February 8, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.