+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LWD - Majority; do pass.
- LWD - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor