+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 31, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor