+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020*.
- Chapter 26, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (PS 20). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On February 8, 2020 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.