+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 130, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (FIN 18). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
On December 8, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor