+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 10/9/2015*.
- Chapter 24, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session.
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 4.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
- Held on first reading.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On June 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House Rules 3.
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FIN 15).
- Placed on second reading.
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:15 PM.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 11:00 AM.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2263-S AMH SPRI MEYE 094
ADOPTED 06/28/2015