+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 9/26/2015.
- Chapter 11, 2015 Laws 2nd Special Session.
- Governor signed.
On June 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Held for further consideration.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2253 AMH HUDG MURD 193
ADOPTED 06/11/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor