+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 20). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.