+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).