+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. (View Original Bill)
On December 6, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor