+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
- Referred to Rules.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (PS 14).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- PS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor