+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 6:00 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor