+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 16, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor