+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; do pass.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APPE 14).
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM.
- APPE - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- APPE - Executive action taken by committee.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor