+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass.
- JUDI - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.