+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; do pass.
- CDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 20, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor