+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- SG - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 10:00 AM.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor