+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor