+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 9/26/2015.
- Chapter 10, 2015 Laws 2nd Special Session.
- Governor signed.
On June 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Held for further consideration.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 9.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- FIN - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; do pass.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2122 AMH MCBR H2805.4
ADOPTED 06/11/2015