+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- HSMH - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)