+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM failed.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).