+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- HE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Work session and public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On December 5, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.