+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- NRP - Majority; do pass.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 15).
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- AGNR - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).