+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/14/2013*.
- Chapter 2, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session.
- Governor signed.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 11.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
+ − Amendments (3)
2075 AMH CARL H2670.2
ADOPTED AS AMENDED 06/13/2013
2075 AMH CARL H2672.2
ADOPTED 06/13/2013
2075 AMH CARL H2672.1
WITHDRAWN 06/13/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor