+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 29, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Held on first reading.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Held on first reading.