+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 1/1/2014*.
- Chapter 10, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session.
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 83; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On June 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 11.
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On June 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 9.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 13).
- Placed on second reading.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2069-S AMS HILL S3050.1
ADOPTED 06/28/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor