+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
2045 AMH TAYL CALL 065
FAILED 04/25/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor