+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (3)
2033 AMH GOOD H3571.1
ADOPTED 02/15/2016
2033 AMH RODN HARO 239
FAILED 03/04/2015