+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Local Government. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ENVI 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor