+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor