+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)