+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Chapter 276, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HEWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
On February 13, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor