+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 16).
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1983-S2 AMH POLL MOET 822
ADOPTED 02/15/2016