+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Capital Budget.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (CB 17). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Capital Budget.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor