+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 13.
On June 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 13).
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1978-S AMH ZEIG MUNN 436
ADOPTED 04/18/2013
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor