+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)