+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2013.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 7, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On June 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 11.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM.
On June 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 4.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 13).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations.
+ − Amendment
1961-S AMS PADD S2976.1
NOT ADOPTED 06/23/2013