+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 29, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House Rules.
On June 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.