+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- HOUS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. (View Original Bill)